+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/29/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor