+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Received from the House
- Referred to Administration
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Bonnen, Dennis
Type:
Primary Sponsor