+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (76)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor