+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor