+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Recommitted to committee
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor