+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor