+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Davis, John
Type:
Primary Sponsor