+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor