+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
- Read first time
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On December 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed