+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/24/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor