+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor