+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor