+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Laid on the table subject to call
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Posting rule suspended
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
- Permission to introduce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor