+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor