+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor