+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (72)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/9/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor