+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed