+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/9/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/3/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor