+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/16/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor