+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed