+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor