+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor