+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (119)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Point of order overruled
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Postponed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Vote reconsidered
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Amendment withdrawn
- Vote reconsidered
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Amended
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor