+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed