+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor