+ − Actions (52)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor