+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor