+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed