+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor