+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor