+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on2/28/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed