+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/8/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed