+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/15/2019
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Recalled from subcommittee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on4/11/2019
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor