+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor