+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/25/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor