+ − Actions (27)
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor