+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor