+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor