+ − Actions (40)
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed