+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/15/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor