+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/16/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/10/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor