+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Amendment withdrawn
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed