+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/12/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed