+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 3, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor