+ − Actions (55)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/09
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed