+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor