+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Recommitted to committee
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/31/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed