+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor