+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed