+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor